Name (Birth–Death) | Took office | Left office | ||
Sir Francis Mudie(1890–1976) | 15 Aug 1947 | 2 Aug 1949 | ||
Abdur Rab Nishtar (1899–1958) | 2 Aug 1949 | 24 Nov 1951 | ||
Ibrahim Ismail Chundrigar (1898–1960) | 24 Nov 1951 | 2 May 1953 | ||
Mian Aminuddin | 2 May 1953 | 24 Jun 1954 | ||
Habib Ibrahim Rahimtoola (1912–1991) | 24 Jun 1954 | >26 Nov 1954 | ||
Mushtaq Ahmed Gurmani (1905–1981) | 27 Nov 1954 | 14 Oct 1955 | ||
Lt Gen Attiqur Rahman | 1 Jul1970 | 23 Dec 1971 | ||
Ghulam Mustafa Khar | 23 Dec 1971 | 12 November 1973 | ||
Sadiq Hussain Qureshi | 12 November 1973 | 14 Mar 1975 | ||
Ghulam Mustafa Khar | 14 Mar 1975 | 31 Jul 1975 | ||
Mohammad Abbas Abbasi | 31 Jul 1975 | 5 Jul 1977 | ||
Justice Aslam Riaz Hussain | 5 Jul 1977 | 18 Sept 1978 | ||
Lt Gen Sawar Khan | 18 Sept 1978 | 1 May 1980 | ||
Lt Gen Ghulam Jilani Khan | 1 May 1980 | 30 Dec 1985 | ||
Sajjad Hussain Qureshi | 30 Dec 1985 | 9 Dec 1988 | ||
Gen Tikka Khan | 9 Dec 1988 | 6 Aug 1990 | ||
Mian Muhammad Azhar | 6 Aug 1990 | 25 Apr 1993 | ||
Chaudhary Altaf Hussain | 25 Apr 1993 | 19 Jul 1993 | ||
Lt Gen Muhammad Iqbal | 19 Jul 1993 | 26 Mar 1994 | ||
Chaudhary Altaf Hussain | 26 Mar 1994 | 22 May 1995 | ||
Justice Muhammad Ilyas | 22 May 1995 | 19 Jun 1995 | ||
Lt Gen Raja Saroop Khan | 19 Jun 1995 | 6 Nov 1996 | ||
Justice Khalilur Rehman | 6 Nov 1996 | 11 Nov 1996 | ||
Khawaja Tariq Rahim | 11 Nov 1996 | 11 Mar 1997 | ||
Shahid Hamid | 11 Mar 1997 | 18 Aug 1999 | ||
Zulfiqar Ali Khosa | 18 Aug 1999 | 12 Oct 1999 | ||
Lt Gen Muhammad Safdar | 25 Oct 1999 | 29 Oct 2001 | ||
Lt Gen Khalid Maqbool | 29 Oct 2001 | 16 May 2008 | ||
Salmaan Taseer | 17 May 2008 | 4 Jan 2011 | ||
Rana Muhammad Iqbal | 4 Jan 2011 | 13 Jan 2011 | ||
Latif Khosa | 13 Jan 2011 | 22 Dec 2013 | ||
Makhdoom Syed Ahmed Mahmud | 25 Dec 2013 | 13 May 2013 | ||
Mohammad Sarwar | 2 Aug 2013 | 29 January 2015 | ||
Malik Muhammad Rafique Rajwana | 7 May 2015 | Incumbent |